Craigo v. Elkhart City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Wayne T Craigo |
Defendant: |
Elkhart City Police Department, Elkhart County Sheriff Department and City of Elkhart |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv00112 |
Filed: |
February 15, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
Henry |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael G Gotsch |
Referring Judge: |
Robert L Miller |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 8, 2018 |
Filing
17
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTS 16 MOTION for Leave to Amend 5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Wayne T Craigo; DIRECTS the clerk to file the amended complaint (ECF 16 -1); GRANTS Pla leave to proceed on a claim of deliberate indifference against Dr. Foster in his individual capacity for money damages for failing to prescribe adequate pain medication in violation of the Eighth Amendment; and GRANTS leave to proceed on a claim of deliberate indifference against the Elkhart County Sheriff� 39;s Department and Correct Care Solutions for money damages for maintaining a policy of not carrying or providing Neurontin in violation of the Eighth Amendment; DIRECTS the clerk and the USMS to issue and serve process on Dr. Foster, the Elkhart C ounty Sheriff's Department, and Correct Care Solutions at the Elkhart County Jail with a copy of this order and the amended complaint (ECF 16 -1) as required by 28:1915(d); and ORDERS Dr. Foster, the Elkhart County Sheriff's Department, and Correct Care Solutions, pursuant to 42:1997e(g)(2), to respond as provided in the Fed.R.Civ.P. and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10.1, only to the claims for which Pla has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/8/2018. (Copy mailed to Pla)(lhc)
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
10
OPINION AND ORDER The court GRANTS Wayne T. Craigo until 03/28/2018, to file an amended complaint. If he doesnt respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 02/27/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sct)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?