McCullough v. United States Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Melvin McCullough
Defendant: United States Department of Education, Van Ru Credit Corporation and Corporation Service Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00543
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: Elkhart
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Plaintiff Melvin McCullough. (Spiegel, Rachel)
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 BRIEF re #16 Response to Motion to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Spiegel, Rachel)
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) & for Failure to State a Claim filed by Melvin McCullough. (Spiegel, Rachel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by United States Department of Education.(Ault - AUSA, Wayne)
August 31, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) & for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Van Ru Credit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Strickler, Nicole)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/20/2018. (rmc)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Van Ru Credit Corporation re #11 Amended Complaint Notice Regarding Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Strickler, Nicole)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Melvin McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Van Ru - Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Check from Plaintiff - Exhibit B)(Spiegel, Rachel)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 Response to Motion to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Spiegel, Rachel)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) under Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Melvin McCullough. (Spiegel, Rachel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Van Ru Credit Corporation. (Strickler, Nicole)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) under Rule 12(b)(2) by Defendant Van Ru Credit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Strickler, Nicole)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M Strickler on behalf of Van Ru Credit Corporation (Strickler, Nicole)
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James L McCaslin on behalf of Melvin McCullough (McCaslin, James)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United States Department of Education ; answer due by August 23, 2018. (Ault - AUSA, Wayne)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel H Spiegel on behalf of Melvin McCullough (Spiegel, Rachel)
July 20, 2018 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (nae)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Elkhart Superior Court No. 6, Cause No. 20D06-1806-PL-00121, filed by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ault - AUSA, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. United States Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Wayne T Ault - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Ru Credit Corporation
Represented By: Nicole M Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin McCullough
Represented By: James L McCaslin
Represented By: Rachel H Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?