Coates v. Valeo Financial Advisors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Coates
Defendant: Pamela K Koehler, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, Sara C Blainbridge, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, Mark A Heckler, Evan D Carr, Fidelity Institutional, Lutheran University Association Inc, John T Wortman, Melodie M Alexander, Marion County Clerk of Court, Gregory A Fulk, Judge Heather A Welch, Court of Appeals of Indiana, Marion County Superior Court, Fortuna Gipson, Wayne Turner, John C Trott, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Mary G Willis, David L Ober, "Michelle", Judge Michael P Barnes, "Laron" or "Aaron", Judge Paul D Mathias, Greg Pachmayr, Michael J Blinn, Marion County Prosecutor, Judge Elaine B Brown, Kenneth J Munson, Camie J Swanson Hull, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Gibson Insurance Agency Inc and Andrew W Hull
Case Number: 3:2018cv00574
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
2 Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE by Mark A Heckler, Lutheran University Association Inc re #53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Borkowski, John)
September 20, 2018 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support of #53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark A Heckler, Lutheran University Association Inc. (Borkowski, John)
September 20, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Mark A Heckler, Lutheran University Association Inc. (Borkowski, John)
September 19, 2018 Filing 52 JOINT RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION for Order to Inspect Federal Evidence filed by "Laron" or "Aaron", "Michelle", Sara C Blainbridge, Michael J Blinn, Evan D Carr, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Marion County Prosecutor, Marion County Superior Court, Judge Paul D Mathias, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, David L Ober, Greg Pachmayr, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis. (Cochran, Kelly)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Court GRANTS #50 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff to respond to Marion County Clerk of Court's Motion to Dimiss by 10/15/2018. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/18/2018. Text entry only. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (tc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Aaron Coates. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Proposed Order)(nae)
September 13, 2018 Set Deadlines: Mark A Heckler, Lutheran University Association Inc answer due 9/28/2018 re #28 . (tc)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: Court GRANTS #10 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; GRANTS #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; GRANTS #18 Motion for Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; GRANTS #24 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Plead. Defendants Pamela K Koehler, "Laron" or "Aaron", "Michelle", Judge Michael P Barnes, Sara C Blainbridge, Judge Elaine B Brown, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Court of Appeals of Indiana, Marion County Prosecutor, Marion County Superior Court, Judge Paul D Mathias, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, David L Ober, Greg Pachmayr, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis, Melodie M Alexander, Michael J Blinn, Evan D Carr, Gregory A Fulk, Fortuna Gipson, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Kenneth J Munson, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, John T Wortman, Fidelity Institutional to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint by 9/28/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/11/2018. Text entry order. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (tc)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Court GRANTS #46 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Gibson Insurance Agency Inc to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint by 9/28/2018. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/6/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(tc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Melodie M Alexander, Michael J Blinn, Evan D Carr, Gregory A Fulk, Fortuna Gipson, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Kenneth J Munson, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, John T Wortman. (Dorelli, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint,,,, by Defendant Gibson Insurance Agency Inc. (Fitzharris, Kevin)
September 5, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin K Fitzharris on behalf of Gibson Insurance Agency Inc (Fitzharris, Kevin)
September 5, 2018 Filing 44 Plaintiff's BRIEF in Support of #43 MOTION for Order to Inspect Federal Evidence filed by Aaron Coates. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)
September 5, 2018 Filing 43 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Inspect Federal Evidence by Plaintiff Aaron Coates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nae)
September 5, 2018 Filing 42 Plaintiff's BRIEF in Support of #41 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Aaron Coates. (nae)
September 5, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Default Judgment titled as Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Judgment, as to by Plaintiff Aaron Coates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nae)
August 31, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by Marion County Clerk of Court re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Pro Se Right to Respond (Helms, Grant)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from all further proceedings in this case. The Clerk is ORDERED to randomly reassign this case to a Magistrate Judge within the District for the purpose of conducting all non-dispositive pretrial proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and the General Orders of this Court. Judge Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/30/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
August 30, 2018 Filing 38 SUPPLEMENT to #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint,,,, by Defendants Melodie M Alexander, Michael J Blinn, Evan D Carr, Gregory A Fulk, Fortuna Gipson, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Kenneth J Munson, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, John T Wortman. (Dorelli, Michael) Modified on 8/31/2018 to reflect document title(tc).
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Given the number of named defendants in this case, the Court encourages Defendants to join their responsive pleadings and motions, where appropriate. It is ORDERED, however, that any dispositive motions must be accompanied by the same notice described in the Court's previous entry [DE 36], given the Plaintiff's pro se status. Such notice shall be filed and served on Plaintiff. This is a text-only order by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/30/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(saj)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - In light of Plaintiff's pro se status and given the dispositive nature of the Defendant Marion County Clerk of Court's Motion to Dismiss [DE 34] and supporting brief [DE 35], the Court hereby ORDERS said Defendant to file and serve on Plaintiff a notice of the pending motion, similar to that found in Appendix C of the Local Rules but tailored to a motion to dismiss. The notice shall be accompanied by a copy of any pertinent Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, as well as a copy of Defendant's motion [DE 34] and supporting brief [DE 35]. Any response from Plaintiff shall be filed within 14 days after the notice is served. This is a text-only order by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/30/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(saj)
August 29, 2018 Filing 35 BRIEF in Support of #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marion County Clerk of Court. (Helms, Grant)
August 29, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Marion County Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Helms, Grant)
August 29, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant E Helms on behalf of Marion County Clerk of Court (Helms, Grant)
August 28, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Coates. Mark A Heckler served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (nae)
August 28, 2018 Filing 31 OBJECTION to Defendants' Collective Motion for Extension of Time by Aaron Coates to #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint . (nae)
August 28, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Coates. David L Ober served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (nae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: #1 Corrected document) (nae).
August 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sara Blainbridge answer due 8/29/2018 (nae)
August 28, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Coates. Sara C Blainbridge served on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (nae)
August 28, 2018 Filing 28 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Mark A Heckler, Lutheran University Association Inc ; answer due by September 28, 2018. (Borkowski, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lutheran University Association Inc. (Borkowski, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandra Ostojic Rushing on behalf of Mark A Heckler, Lutheran University Association Inc (Rushing, Aleksandra)
August 27, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Borkowski on behalf of Mark A Heckler, Lutheran University Association Inc (Borkowski, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint,,,, Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Fidelity Institutional. (Meyer, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lawrence Meyer on behalf of Fidelity Institutional (Meyer, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP. (Dorelli, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valeo Financial Advisors LLC. (Dorelli, Michael)
August 22, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hensel on behalf of Melodie M Alexander, Michael J Blinn, Evan D Carr, Gregory A Fulk, Fortuna Gipson, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Kenneth J Munson, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, John T Wortman (Hensel, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint,,,, by Defendants Melodie M Alexander, Michael J Blinn, Evan D Carr, Gregory A Fulk, Fortuna Gipson, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Kenneth J Munson, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, John T Wortman. (Dorelli, Michael)
August 22, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Dorelli on behalf of Melodie M Alexander, Michael J Blinn, Evan D Carr, Gregory A Fulk, Fortuna Gipson, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Kenneth J Munson, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, John T Wortman (Dorelli, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To ensure the continued protection of Judge Barnes, Judge Welch, Judge Willis, Commissioner Ober, and General Hill, the Court sua sponte ORDERS the parties to redact their home addresses from future filings that require reference to them. Additionally, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to redact their home addresses if inadvertently included in future filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/21/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(rmc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REDACTION to #8 Order on Motion to Seal, #14 Redacted Document Plaintiff's Summons by Judge Michael P Barnes, David L Ober, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis. (Cochran, Kelly)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REDACTION to #8 Order on Motion to Seal, #13 Order on Motion to Seal, Plaintiff's Complaint by Judge Michael P Barnes, David L Ober, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List)(Cochran, Kelly)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Seal Documents. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that counsel for the Four Movants is permitted to file a redacted version of Plaintiffs Complaint redacting General Hill's home address, as listed on page fifty-one (51) of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/21/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(rmc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Coates. "Laron" or "Aaron" served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; "Michelle" served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Melodie M Alexander served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018; Judge Michael P Barnes served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Michael J Blinn served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018; Judge Elaine B Brown served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Evan D Carr served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018; Court of Appeals of Indiana served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Fidelity Institutional served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018; Gregory A Fulk served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Gibson Insurance Agency Inc served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Fortuna Gipson served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018; Mark A Heckler served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Andrew W Hull served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Susanne (Heckler) Johnson served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018; Pamela K Koehler served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018; Marion County Clerk of Court served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Marion County Prosecutor served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Marion County Superior Court served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Judge Paul D Mathias served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Kenneth J Munson served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Judge Edward W Najam, Jr served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Greg Pachmayr served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Camie J Swanson Hull served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; John C Trott served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Wayne Turner served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Judge Nancy H Vaidik served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Valeo Financial Advisors LLC served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; Mary G Willis served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018; John T Wortman served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Executed Summons)(rmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #2 Restricted Original Unredacted Summons Returned Executed for Judge Barnes and Mary Willis) (rmc).
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Documents by Defendants Judge Michael P Barnes, David L Ober, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis. (Cochran, Kelly)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Defendants "Laron" or "Aaron", "Michelle", Judge Michael P Barnes, Sara C Blainbridge, Judge Elaine B Brown, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Court of Appeals of Indiana, Marion County Prosecutor, Marion County Superior Court, Judge Paul D Mathias, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, David L Ober, Greg Pachmayr, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cochran, Kelly)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Pamela K Koehler. (Britton, Louis)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Joseph Britton on behalf of Pamela K Koehler (Britton, Louis)
August 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency to be cured by 8/21/2018. (tc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Court GRANTS IN PART #7 Motion to Seal. Clerk to maintain #1 Plaintiff's Complaint and his #2 Proposed Summons under seal as outlined. Counsel for the Four Movants to file a redacted version of Plaintiff's Complaint and the Proposed Summons by 8/21/2018, as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/14/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (tc)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Documents by Defendants Judge Michael P Barnes, David L Ober, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis. (Cochran, Kelly)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R Lowry on behalf of "Laron" or "Aaron", "Michelle", Judge Michael P Barnes, Sara C Blainbridge, Judge Elaine B Brown, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Court of Appeals of Indiana, Marion County Prosecutor, Marion County Superior Court, Judge Paul D Mathias, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, David L Ober, Greg Pachmayr, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis (Lowry, Joshua)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D Cochran on behalf of "Laron" or "Aaron", "Michelle", Judge Michael P Barnes, Sara C Blainbridge, Judge Elaine B Brown, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Court of Appeals of Indiana, Marion County Prosecutor, Marion County Superior Court, Judge Paul D Mathias, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, David L Ober, Greg Pachmayr, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis (Cochran, Kelly)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to "Laron" or "Aaron", "Michelle", Melodie M Alexander, Judge Michael P Barnes, Sara C Blainbridge, Michael J Blinn, Judge Elaine B Brown, Evan D Carr, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Court of Appeals of Indiana, Fidelity Institutional, Gregory A Fulk, Gibson Insurance Agency Inc, Fortuna Gipson, Mark A Heckler, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Pamela K Koehler, Lutheran University Association Inc, Marion County Clerk of Court, Marion County Prosecutor, Marion County Superior Court, Judge Paul D Mathias, Kenneth J Munson, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, David L Ober, Greg Pachmayr, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis, John T Wortman. (cc: Plaintiff) NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Aaron Coates. (rmc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 SEALED RE #8 ORDER: Proposed Summons filed by Aaron Coates. (rmc) Modified on 8/2/2018 to correct plaintiff's name (rmc). Modified on 8/14/2018 (tc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 SEALED RE #8 ORDER: PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against "Laron" or "Aaron", "Michelle", Melodie M Alexander, Judge Michael P Barnes, Sara C Blainbridge, Michael J Blinn, Judge Elaine B Brown, Evan D Carr, Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court, Court of Appeals of Indiana, Fidelity Institutional, Gregory A Fulk, Gibson Insurance Agency Inc, Fortuna Gipson, Mark A Heckler, Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP, Andrew W Hull, Susanne (Heckler) Johnson, Pamela K Koehler, Lutheran University Association Inc, Marion County Clerk of Court, Marion County Prosecutor, Marion County Superior Court, Judge Paul D Mathias, Kenneth J Munson, Judge Edward W Najam, Jr, David L Ober, Greg Pachmayr, Camie J Swanson Hull, John C Trott, Wayne Turner, Judge Nancy H Vaidik, Valeo Financial Advisors LLC, Judge Heather A Welch, Mary G Willis, John T Wortman (Filing fee $400.00, Receipt #3020414), filed by Aaron Coates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits) (NO PROPOSED SUMMONS SUBMITTED WITH COMPLAINT)(rmc) Modified on 8/2/2018 to correct plaintiff's name (rmc). Modified on 8/14/2018 (tc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Valeo Financial Advisors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela K Koehler
Represented By: Louis Joseph Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Nancy H Vaidik
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Edward W Najam, Jr
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara C Blainbridge
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeo Financial Advisors LLC
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Heckler
Represented By: John W Borkowski
Represented By: Aleksandra Ostojic Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan D Carr
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Institutional
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutheran University Association Inc
Represented By: John W Borkowski
Represented By: Aleksandra Ostojic Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Wortman
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melodie M Alexander
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Clerk of Court
Represented By: Grant E Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A Fulk
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Heather A Welch
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court of Appeals of Indiana
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Superior Court
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortuna Gipson
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Turner
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Trott
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Indiana Appellate and Supreme Court
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary G Willis
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Ober
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Michelle"
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Michael P Barnes
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Laron" or "Aaron"
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Paul D Mathias
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Pachmayr
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Blinn
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Prosecutor
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Elaine B Brown
Represented By: Joshua R Lowry
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth J Munson
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camie J Swanson Hull
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoover, Hull, Turner LLP
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne (Heckler) Johnson
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: Kevin K Fitzharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew W Hull
Represented By: Michael A Dorelli
Represented By: David J Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?