Burns et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Diane M Burns and Bernard E Burns
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00772
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bernard E Burns, Diane M Burns. United States of America (AUSA) served on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (jld)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bernard E Burns, Diane M Burns. USAG served 11/9/18. (jld)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bernard E Burns, Diane M Burns. USA c/o Internal Revenue Service served 11/9/18 (jld)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (Copy to USM). (nal)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 and #3 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court WAIVES payment of the filing fee and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/4/18. (Copy to USM). (nal)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Diane M Burns. (Thomas, Patrick)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bernard E Burns. (Thomas, Patrick)
September 24, 2018 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States of America, filed by Bernard E Burns, Diane M Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Thomas, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane M Burns
Represented By: Patrick W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard E Burns
Represented By: Patrick W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?