Hudak v. St. Joseph County et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hudak and Jennifer L Hudak
Defendant: St. Joseph County, Arielle Brandy and St Joseph County Board of Commissioners of
Case Number: 3:2018cv00932
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Arielle Brandy, St Joseph County Board of Commissioners of, St. Joseph County.(Groves, James)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by St. Joseph County, Arielle Brandy.The Court sua sponte EXTENDS Defendants' responsive pleading deadline until January 4, 2019, consistent with their requested deadline related to the original complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/12/18. (ksp)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arielle Brandy, St. Joseph County, filed by Jennifer L Hudak.(McQuary, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Arielle Brandy, St. Joseph County. (Groves, James)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James F Groves on behalf of All Defendants (Groves, James)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Arielle Brandy, St. Joseph County. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Jennifer L Hudak. (Pfeifer, Daniel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by Jennifer L Hudak. (Pfeifer, Daniel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 No Proposed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service received. (sct)
November 16, 2018 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jennifer Hudak. (McQuary, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S McQuary on behalf of Jennifer Hudak (McQuary, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3734839.), filed by Jennifer Hudak.(Pfeifer, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudak v. St. Joseph County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph County
Represented By: James F Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arielle Brandy
Represented By: James F Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Joseph County Board of Commissioners of
Represented By: James F Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hudak
Represented By: Jeffrey S McQuary
Represented By: Daniel H Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Hudak
Represented By: Jeffrey S McQuary
Represented By: Daniel H Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?