Signal Peak Energy, LLC v. Sullair LLC
Plaintiff: Signal Peak Energy, LLC
Defendant: Sullair LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01026
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sullair LLC answer due 2/27/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/28/19. (cck)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint by Defendant Sullair LLC. (Milstone, James)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Milstone on behalf of Sullair LLC (Milstone, James)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Signal Peak Energy, LLC. Sullair LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Farnham, Geoffrey)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sullair LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
December 27, 2018 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sullair LLC, filed by Signal Peak Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Farnham, Geoffrey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sullair LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3767340.), filed by Signal Peak Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Farnham, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signal Peak Energy, LLC v. Sullair LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullair LLC
Represented By: James H Milstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signal Peak Energy, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey D Farnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?