Dollahan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Martha Dollahan
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00011
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/18/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2019 10:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/26/19. (slm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Bengs, Tina)
January 14, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 2/5/2019. (mlc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ; answer due by February 5, 2019. (Bengs, Tina)
January 9, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. *NEW CASE* (jss)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Hartford Life Inc, Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.. (Bengs, Tina)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina M Bengs on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Bengs, Tina)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3776458.) from Marshall Circuit Court, Cause No. 50C01-1812-CT-000052, filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, state court record, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in state court action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bengs, Tina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dollahan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Tina M Bengs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Dollahan
Represented By: Jeffrey J Stesiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?