Roberts v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Lisa A. Roberts
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Undetermined: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00086
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Lisa A. Roberts. Commissioner of Social Security (AUSA) served on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (rmc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Lisa A. Roberts. Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney General) served on 3/4/2019. (rmc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Lisa A. Roberts. Commissioner of Social Security (Regional Counsel) served on 3/4/2019. (rmc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Keeya M Jeffrey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jeffrey, Keeya)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USM) (sct)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF #2 ). WAIVES payment of the filing fee. DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 02/13/2019. (cc: USM) (sct)
February 12, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio added (NEW CASE - IFP MOTION PENDING). (ksc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Marcus on behalf of Lisa A. Roberts (Marcus, Meredith)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Lisa A. Roberts (Daley, Frederick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Lisa A. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (Commissioner), #2 USM-285 (Attorney General), #3 USM-285 (U.S. Attorney))(Daley, Frederick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lisa A. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses Combined)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Roberts
Represented By: Meredith Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Keeya M Jeffrey
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?