Inmates of St Joe County et al v. Lawson
Plaintiff: Tyrese Winters, Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers, S Ortiz-R, William James Freeman, Kenneth Eugene Stroder, III, Kenneth Stroder, Robin Peppers, Bradley Clark, Quentone Gandy, Shane Seidelmann, Dennis Lane, Travis Norman, Dequan Demarco Briggs, William J Freeman, Tyrese Carnell Winters, Quervo Taylor, Rozell Simmons, Inmates of St Joe County, Zachary Lubin, Kenneth Sanders, Santiago Ortiz-Ruvalcaba, Chad C Prince, Allen Miller, Jerry Shafer, Tyler Cowsert, Tyrese C Winters and Chad Prince
Defendant: Julie Lawson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00207
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers from 1215 Goodland Ave to 1322 Elliot St South Bend IN 46628 (Sent docket sheet and Order De #9 and Clerk's Judgment DE #11 to new address by certified mail 9590 9402 4437 8248 1717 62) (nae)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Mail Returned from Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers as Undeliverable - Unclaimed / Unable to Forward re: #10 Clerks Judgment, #9 Order Dismissing Case. (nae)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7000 1670 0012 9260 9901). (bas)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7000 1670 0012 9261 0105) (bas) Modified on 5/2/2019 (bas).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff to pay 20% of money received each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received by way of custodial facility, until $400.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk DIRECTED to create a ledger for receipt of these funds. Clerk DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 5/1/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail 7000 1670 0012 9261 0105)(cc: South Bend Financial)(bas) Modified on 5/2/2019 to add certified mail(bas). Modified on 5/3/2019 (bas).
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned from Robin Dale Kilore Peppers as Undeliverable - Not in Custody re #4 Order. Mail forwarded to new address. (sct)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned from Robin Peppers as Undeliverable - Released re: Plaintiff's copy of #1 Pro Se Complaint. (Forwarded to new address) (nae)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned from Robin Peppers as Undeliverable - #3 Order,,. (marked Released 3/28/2019)(jld)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers from St Joseph County Jail to 1215 Goodland Ave South Bend, IN 46628 (nae)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers. GRANTS Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers until 4/30/2019, to file an amended complaint on that form plausibly alleging that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury OR pay the $400 filing fee. CAUTIONS Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A because the current complaint does not plausibly allege that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 3/28/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(sct) Modified on 4/10/2019 resent to Goodland address (nae).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Pro Se Complaint: DISMISSES Inmates of St. Joe County; DISMISSES from this case and DIRECTS the clerk to open separate cases for Chad C. Prince, Travis Norman, Kenneth Eugene Stroder, III, Allen Miller, Tyler Cowsert, William James Freeman, Jerry Shafer, Zachary Lubin, Shane Seidelmann, S. Ortiz-R, Quervo Taylor, Bradley Clark, Dequan Demarco Briggs, Tyrese Winters, Kenneth Sanders, Dennis Lane, Rozell Simmons, and Quentone Gandy with the complaint from this case (ECF 1); DIRECTS the clerk to directly assign these related, newly opened cases pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1(e). Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 3/27/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(nae) Modified on 4/10/2019 Resent to Goodland address (nae).
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers. (nae)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 2 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Julie Lawson, filed by William James Freeman, Tyrese Winters, Kenneth Eugene Stroder, III, Dennis Lane, Inmates of St Joe County, Quervo Taylor, Jerry Shafer, S Ortiz-R, Rozell Simmons, Travis Norman, Kenneth Sanders, Quentone Gandy, Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers, Allen Miller, Dequan Demarco Briggs, Zachary Lubin, Shane Seidelmann, Tyler Cowsert, Bradley Clark, Chad C Prince. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons and USM 285 form, #2 Envelope) (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Peppers only)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inmates of St Joe County et al v. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrese Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Dale Kilgore Peppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S Ortiz-R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eugene Stroder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Stroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Peppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentone Gandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Seidelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dequan Demarco Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrese Carnell Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quervo Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozell Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inmates of St Joe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Ortiz-Ruvalcaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad C Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Cowsert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrese C Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?