Crawford et al v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Crawford and Troy Crawford
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-50 and American Medical Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00251
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. having filed a Supplement to Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, and the Court being duly advised in the premises, now takes judicial notice of the Pretrial Order from the related MDL proceeding (MDL 2325). The Court incorporates by reference the stipulation for production of documents and electronically stored information, which was contained in the Pretrial Order in the related MDL proceeding (MDL 2325). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/1/19. (ksp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT to #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Pretrial Order #15, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Pretrial Order #169)(Molter, Derek)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties discovery plan and establishes the following deadlines: The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 8/2/2019. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 3/9/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts are due from plaintiff by 1/13/2020 and from defendant(s) by 1/27/2020. The last date to amend the pleadings without leave of court as to plaintiff is 8/19/2019 and as for defendant is 8/26/2019. Because the presiding judge will set the deadline for dispositive motions and trial date, the summary judgment deadline in Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 shall not apply in this case. The parties shall name a mediator no later than 9/6/2019. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 5/31/2020. Order finding MOOT the Defendants Motion to Appear Telephonically at Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference, DE #15 . The Court hereby VACATES the hearing scheduled for 7/3/2019 at 11:45 A.M. (EDT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/26/2019. (sct)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Molter, Derek)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Molter, Derek)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/25/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2019 11:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/5/19. (slm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Medical Systems, Inc..(Molter, Derek)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Molter, Derek)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas O Plouff terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/14/19. (slm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Attorney Thomas O. Plouff by Plaintiffs Nicole Crawford, Troy Crawford. (Plouff, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edward A. Wallace PHV for Nicole Crawford and Troy Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 05/10/2019. (ace)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Edward A. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nicole and Troy Crawford. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3885111(Wallace PHV, Edward)
May 7, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #6 Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. answer due 6/3/2019. (rmc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by American Medical Systems, Inc. ; answer due by June 3, 2019. (Molter, Derek)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek R Molter on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc. (Molter, Derek)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William J McDonough PHV for American Medical Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 05/01/2019. (ace)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Attorney William J. McDonough to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3877927 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Medical Systems, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against American Medical Systems, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3849704.), filed by Nicole Crawford, Troy Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to American Medical Systems, Inc.)(Plouff, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford et al v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Crawford
Represented By: Thomas O Plouff
Represented By: Edward A Wallace PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Crawford
Represented By: Thomas O Plouff
Represented By: Edward A Wallace PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William J McDonough PHV
Represented By: Derek R Molter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?