May v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David A May
Defendant: social security administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00329
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David A May. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Green Cards))(de la Torre, Adriana)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana M de la Torre on behalf of David A May (de la Torre, Adriana)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 3022310 (rmc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons filed by David A May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Morgan, Anne)
May 2, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr added. (New Case) (No filing fee or IFP received) (sct)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by David A May. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Morgan, Anne) Modified on 4/29/2019 to edit pltf(sct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A May
Represented By: Anne B Morgan
Represented By: Adriana M de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: social security administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?