Wingo v. Rite of Passage DePaul Academy et al
Plaintiff: Tonjia C Wingo, Sr
Defendant: Rite of Passage DePaul Academy, Michelle Ruth and Ike Shipman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00351
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER by Rite of Passage DePaul Academy, Michelle Ruth, Ike Shipman Waiver of Service of Summons. (Antaki, Vincent)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P Antaki on behalf of Rite of Passage DePaul Academy, Michelle Ruth, Ike Shipman (Antaki, Vincent)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Rite of Passage DePaul Academy, Ike Shipman, Michelle Ruth. Waiver of Service due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (sct) Modified on 5/10/2019 (sct). (cc: Pro Se Party)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF #2 ). DEFERS payment of the filing fee. ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery that is received in this case. DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendants. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/9/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sct)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tonjia C Wingo, Sr. (jld)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms against Rite of Passage DePaul Academy, Michelle Ruth, Ike Shipman, filed by Tonjia C Wingo, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons & USM-285 forms)(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wingo v. Rite of Passage DePaul Academy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonjia C Wingo, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite of Passage DePaul Academy
Represented By: Vincent P Antaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Ruth
Represented By: Vincent P Antaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ike Shipman
Represented By: Vincent P Antaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?