Citizens Insurance Company of America et al v. Panzica Building Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America and Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Jennifer Pennington, Josh Pennington and Panzica Building Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00387
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 8/6/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2019 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/17/19. (slm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company. Josh Pennington waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Crandell, Patrick)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company. Jennifer Pennington waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Crandell, Patrick)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Panzica Building Corporation answer due 7/19/2019..Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/24/19. (slm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Uyhelji on behalf of Panzica Building Corporation (Uyhelji, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Panzica Building Corporation. (Gardner, Martin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J Gardner on behalf of Panzica Building Corporation (Gardner, Martin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT RE: JURISDICTION regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cernak, Margaret)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenship of all parties by 6/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/18/19. (ksc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Jennifer Pennington, Josh Pennington.(Pfeifer, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company. Panzica Building Corporation served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Crandell, Patrick)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H Pfeifer on behalf of Jennifer Pennington, Josh Pennington (Pfeifer, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A Cernak on behalf of Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company (Cernak, Margaret)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanover Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for Hanover Insurance Company.. (Crandell, Patrick)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for Citizens Insurance Company of America.. (Crandell, Patrick)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Panzica Building Corporation, Jennifer Pennington, Josh Pennington. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
May 21, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Panzica Building Corporation, Jennifer Pennington, Josh Pennington( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3898850.), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons Panzica Building Corporation, #8 Proposed Summons Jennifer Pennington, #9 Proposed Summons Josh Pennington)(Crandell, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Insurance Company of America et al v. Panzica Building Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Pennington
Represented By: Daniel H Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Pennington
Represented By: Daniel H Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panzica Building Corporation
Represented By: Martin J Gardner
Represented By: Christopher J Uyhelji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Patrick D Crandell
Represented By: Margaret A Cernak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick D Crandell
Represented By: Margaret A Cernak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?