Carlson v. Symetra Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Krystin Carlson
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00399
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Symetra Life Insurance Company, filed by Krystin Carlson.(O'Ryan, Bridget)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (termination letter April 2019))(Kersting, Edna)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Kersting, Edna)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Partial ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Symetra Life Insurance Company.(Kersting, Edna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company ; answer due by July 10, 2019. (Kersting, Edna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edna S Kersting on behalf of Symetra Life Insurance Company (Kersting, Edna)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystin Carlson. Symetra Life Insurance Company served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Symetra Life Insurance Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
May 23, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L O'Ryan on behalf of Krystin Carlson (O'Ryan, Bridget)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Symetra Life Insurance Company( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3901515.), filed by Krystin Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Ryan, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Symetra Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna S Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystin Carlson
Represented By: Bridget L O'Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?