Gracie v. Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC et al
Plaintiff: MARCUS GRACIE
Defendant: Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC, H. B. FULLER COMPANY and H B Fuller Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00410
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H B Fuller Company identifying Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent BlackRock Institutional Trust Company, N.A. for H B Fuller Company.. (Lukowicz, Amber)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant H B Fuller Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lukowicz, Amber)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC identifying Corporate Parent H.B. Fuller Company for Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC.. (Lukowicz, Amber)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC.(Lukowicz, Amber)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber N Lukowicz on behalf of H B Fuller Company, Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC (Lukowicz, Amber)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer due 07/22/2019 as to All Defendants. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/24/19. (slm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants H B Fuller Company, Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC. (Spitzzeri, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H B Fuller Company, Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC re #8 Notice of Appearance (Carlos, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Carlos on behalf of H B Fuller Company, Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC (Carlos, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H B Fuller Company, Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC re #6 Notice of Appearance (Spitzzeri, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Spitzzeri on behalf of H B Fuller Company, Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC (Spitzzeri, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Gracie. All Defendants. (Falks, Heather)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to H B Fuller Company, Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
May 29, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S Stewart on behalf of MARCUS GRACIE (Stewart, Darron)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R Falks on behalf of MARCUS GRACIE (Falks, Heather)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3906047.), filed by MARCUS GRACIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Rights to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Falks, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gracie v. Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Adhesives and Sealants LLC
Represented By: Amber N Lukowicz
Represented By: Joseph F Spitzzeri
Represented By: Christopher J Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. B. FULLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H B Fuller Company
Represented By: Amber N Lukowicz
Represented By: Joseph F Spitzzeri
Represented By: Christopher J Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS GRACIE
Represented By: Heather R Falks
Represented By: Darron S Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?