Jordan v. Mackala et al
Plaintiff: Victor L Jordan
Defendant: Andy Hynek, Grieta S Friedman, Michigan City Police Officer's, Ryan Beal, Elizabeth A Boehm, Michael S Bergerson, Bill Hackney, James Mackala, John A Link and Woolum
Case Number: 3:2019cv00518
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Victor Jordan re: evidence to be added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (rmc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Filing fee: $15.07, receipt number 3022997 (rmc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Victor Jordan re: evidence to be added (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (nae)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff to immediately pay $15.07 to clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/30/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Victor L Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Preamble and The Declaration of Independence, #2 Envelope)(nae)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint, filed by Victor L Jordan. (nae) (Prisoner Complaint sent as requested)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO240 (Rev.7/10)(INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Victor L. Jordan, GRANTS Victor L. Jordan until 8/9/19 to return the form with his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline this case will be dismissed without further notice, which will not relieve him of the obligation to pay the filing fee in installments over time. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/9/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Victor L Jordan. (nae)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 4 copies of summons forms and 4 copies of USM-285 forms against Ryan Beal, Michael S Bergerson, Elizabeth A Boehm, Grieta S Friedman, Bill Hackney, Andy Hynek, John A Link, James Mackala, Michigan City Police Officer's, Woolum, filed by Victor L Jordan. (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Jordan) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons and USM 285 forms, #2 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Mackala et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor L Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hynek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieta S Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan City Police Officer's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Bergerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mackala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woolum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?