Ulrey v. School Board of Manchester Community Schools
Plaintiff: Lisa Ulrey
Defendant: Board of School Trustees of Manchester Community Schools, Jon Lippe and School Board of Manchester Community Schools
Case Number: 3:2019cv00524
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2019 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Jon Lippe, School Board of Manchester Community Schools.(Blevins, Sara) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jss).
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Jon Lippe, School Board of Manchester Community Schools.(Blevins, Sara)
July 11, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE (kjp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L Cooper on behalf of Board of School Trustees of Manchester Community Schools, Jon Lippe (Cooper, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Board of School Trustees of Manchester Community Schools, Jon Lippe Initial Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint to August 12, 2019 (no response from Plaintiff's counsel to request for extension) (Blevins, Sara)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R Blevins on behalf of Board of School Trustees of Manchester Community Schools, Jon Lippe (Blevins, Sara)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3945459.) from Wabash County Superior Court, Cause No. 85D01-1906-CT-000495, filed by Jon Lippe, Board of School Trustees of Manchester Community Schools. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Sture Appearance, #4 Exhibit C - Summons)(Blevins, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulrey v. School Board of Manchester Community Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of School Trustees of Manchester Community Schools
Represented By: Sara R Blevins
Represented By: Michelle L Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Lippe
Represented By: Sara R Blevins
Represented By: Michelle L Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Board of Manchester Community Schools
Represented By: Sara R Blevins
Represented By: Michelle L Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ulrey
Represented By: Tae Sture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?