Halligan v. K&C RV Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guy Halligan
Defendant: K&C RV Centers, LLC and Thor Motor Coach Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00540
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE of Expert Witness filed by Guy Halligan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Diminished Value Appraisal)(Wynkoop, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 8/11/2019.Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/1/19. (slm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosure by Plaintiff Guy Halligan. (Wynkoop, Richard)
July 24, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B Wynkoop on behalf of Guy Halligan (Wynkoop, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner; Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak and Joel Aaron Richardson terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/19/19. (slm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of K. Dvorchak, R. Wagner, and J. Richardson by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Gasper, Trevor)
July 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by T Michael Pangburn on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Pangburn, T)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-03003. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/12/2019 cc: Non-ECF Registered Attys Dvorchak, Wagner, Richardson(rmc).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TRANSFERRING VENUE. The parties' stipulation, the motion (Doc. #22 .) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against K&C RV Centers, LLC are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and to close this case. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 07/11/2019. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana by Defendants K&C RV Centers, LLC, Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Richardson, Joel) Modified on 7/11/2019 to correct event (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico, upon his appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03003-DDD-MEH. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner (Wagner, Rebecca) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/24/2019. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/24/2019. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Guy Halligan. (Wynkoop, Richard) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants K&C RV Centers, LLC, Thor Motor Coach, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Richardson, Joel) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak on behalf of K&C RV Centers, LLC, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.Attorney Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak added to party K&C RV Centers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak added to party Thor Motor Coach, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dvorchak, Kirstin) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/12/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/11/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of K&C RV Centers, LLC, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.Attorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party K&C RV Centers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party Thor Motor Coach, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard B. Wynkoop on behalf of Guy HalliganAttorney Richard B. Wynkoop added to party Guy Halligan(pty:pla) (Wynkoop, Richard) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by K&C RV Centers, LLC, Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Richardson, Joel) Modified on 11/30/2018 to add linkage. (sphil, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc., K&C RV Centers, LLC, for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1(e) ("All pleadings and documents shall be double spaced.") Defendants may refile a complying document on or before Friday, November 30, 2018. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/29/18. (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 STRICKEN Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint by K&C RV Centers, LLC, Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Richardson, Joel) Modified on 11/29/2018 to add text STRICKEN per Docket No. 9 (pabsec). [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, Attachment(s) upon Thor Motor Coach, Inc. on 10/24/2018 (dbera, ) Modified to correct filing date on 11/23/2018 (dbera, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Attend and Produce and Exhibit 1 to Subpoena upon Emily Rauch for K&C RV Centers, LLC on 10/24/2018 (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against K&C RV Centers, LLC, Thor Motor Coach, Inc., filed by Guy Halligan.(dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thor Motor Coach, Inc., K&C RV Centers, LLC from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2018CV31738. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6407368), filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc., K&C RV Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Summons (K&C), #5 State Court Summons (Thor), #6 State Court Complaint, #7 State Court District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 State Court Affidavit of Service (K&C), #9 State Court Affidavit of Service (Thor), #10 State Court Civil Procedure Order, #11 State Court Order re: Initial Disclosures, #12 State Court Notice of Potential Dismissal, #13 State Court Register of Actions)(Richardson, Joel) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halligan v. K&C RV Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&C RV Centers, LLC
Represented By: Joel Aaron Richardson
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Represented By: Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Represented By: Joel Aaron Richardson
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Represented By: Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: T Michael Pangburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Halligan
Represented By: Richard B Wynkoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?