Lowder v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Curt Lowder
Defendant: K Willson, Other Indiana State Prison Staff et al and Neal
Case Number: 3:2019cv00551
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ron Neal)(Smith, Ilene)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Status Inquiry Request (sent copy of docket sheet) (nae)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marley G Hancock on behalf of Neal (Hancock, Marley)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neal. (Smith, Ilene)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Neal (Smith, Ilene)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court EXTENDS the deadline to file a response to the motion for a preliminary injunction to 08/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 08/14/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Warden) (jat)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Warden Neal. Waiver of Service due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (mlc)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Lowder leave to proceed on the motion for apreliminary injunction against Warden Neal in his official capacity to takeprotective measures as required by the Eighth Amendment; DISMISSES Lieutenant Wilson and Other Indiana State Prison Staff; DISMISSES all other claims;DIRECTS the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Warden Neal at the Indiana Department of Correction with a copy of this order and the motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF 1) as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(d); and ORDERS Warden Neal to respond to the motion for preliminary injunction by filing an affidavit addressing whether prison officials are acting with deliberate indifference to Curt Lowders safety needs in connection with attacks by other inmates by August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/22/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction titled as Plaintiff's Request to Court for a Immediate Injunction Order to Assure Plaintiff's Safety and Well-Being by Plaintiff Curt Lowder. (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowder v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Indiana State Prison Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal
Represented By: Marley G Hancock
Represented By: Ilene M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt Lowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?