McGee et al v. Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad
Plaintiff: Michael J McGee and Rail Industry Specialist Inc
Defendant: Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad
Case Number: 3:2019cv00585
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiffs must file a second supplemental jurisdictional statement on or before 11/08/2019. Until Plaintiffs establish subject matter jurisdiction, all proceedings in this case are STAYED. If after discovery Plaintiffs still cannot establish subject matter jurisdiction, this case will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 09/09/2019. (jat)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Daley, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad. (Daley, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT Supplementing Subject Matter Jurisdiction Allegations regarding #9 Order, Set Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-5)(Bergerson, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a jurisdictional supplement that properly alleges the citizenship of each party to this action by 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/27/19. (ksp)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad ; answer due by 9-6-2019. (Daley, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Daley on behalf of Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad (Daley, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: per DE 6, Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad answer due 8/23/2019. (mlc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Defendant Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad on August 2, 2019, filed by Michael J McGee, Rail Industry Specialist Inc. (Bergerson, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rail Industry Specialist Inc. (Bergerson, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
August 2, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Michael J McGee, Rail Industry Specialist Inc. (Bergerson, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Bergerson, Jr on behalf of Michael J McGee, Rail Industry Specialist Inc (Bergerson, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3966845.), filed by Michael J McGee, Rail Industry Specialist Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hamann, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee et al v. Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J McGee
Represented By: Peter D Hamann
Represented By: Michael S Bergerson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rail Industry Specialist Inc
Represented By: Peter D Hamann
Represented By: Michael S Bergerson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago South Shore & South Bend Railroad
Represented By: Michael J Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?