McMorris v. American Senior Communities LLC et al
Plaintiff: CORA MCMORRIS
Defendant: AMERICAN SENIOR COMMUNITIES LLC d/b/a CARDINAL NURSING & REHABILITATION, American Senior Communities LLC, Eaglecare, LLC, EP NO MORE, INC. f/k/a EAGLE CARE INC. and EP No More Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00654
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Answer for defendants due by 11/11/2019 per #8 Agreed Notice. (jld)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by American Senior Communities LLC, American Senior Communities LLC, EP No More Inc, Eaglecare, LLC ; answer due by November 11, 2019. (Michelsen, Jan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan S Michelsen on behalf of All Defendants (Michelsen, Jan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to American Senior Communities LLC, American Senior Communities LLC, EP No More Inc, Eaglecare, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cora McMorris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Amended, #2 Proposed Summons Amended, #3 Proposed Summons Amended, #4 Proposed Summons Amended)(Wolcott, Christopher)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cora McMorris , Filing of Amended Complaint (Wolcott, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Senior Communities LLC, American Senior Communities LLC, EP No More Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
August 21, 2019 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Wolcott on behalf of CORA MCMORRIS (Wolcott, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3983806.), filed by Cora McMorris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons ASC d/b/a, #3 Proposed Summons ASC, #4 Proposed Summons Eaglecare LLC, #5 Proposed Summons EP No More Inc.)(Wolcott, Christopher) Modified on 8/21/2019 proposed summons submitted for Eaglecare, LLC, not issued as Eaglecreek, LLC is the named Defendant in complaint(rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMorris v. American Senior Communities LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN SENIOR COMMUNITIES LLC d/b/a CARDINAL NURSING & REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Senior Communities LLC
Represented By: Jan S Michelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaglecare, LLC
Represented By: Jan S Michelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EP NO MORE, INC. f/k/a EAGLE CARE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EP No More Inc
Represented By: Jan S Michelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORA MCMORRIS
Represented By: Christopher S Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?