Gibbs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: KENNETH GIBBS
Defendant: COMM'R of SOC S ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00664
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/31/2019. (ksc)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Gibbs. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (jld)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc USM)(mrm) Modified on 8/27/2019 (mrm).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/27/2019. (mrm) (cc USM)
August 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE, IFP Motion Pending) (jat)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff KENNETH GIBBS. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USM285, #2 Proposed Summons)(Redelman, Jonelle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonelle L Redelman on behalf of KENNETH GIBBS (Redelman, Jonelle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by KENNETH GIBBS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Redelman, Jonelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMM'R of SOC S ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH GIBBS
Represented By: Jonelle L Redelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?