Ambrosetti v. Oregon Catholic Press et al
Plaintiff: Vincent A Ambrosetti
Defendant: Oregon Catholic Press and Bernadette Farrell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00682
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press Unavailability of Leonard DuBoff (DuBoff PHV, Leonard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leonard D DuBoff PHV for Bernadette Farrell and for Oregon Catholic Press. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 09/20/2019. (mtr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Schmid, Donald)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Attorney Leonard D DuBoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press, Bernadette Farrell. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4012171(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Affidavit of Leonard D. DuBoff) filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summary of Copyright Registration No. PA0000525379)(Kinsman, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Kinsman on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press (Kinsman, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oregon Catholic Press. (Osborn, Kathy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Hurley on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press (Hurley, Ryan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy L Osborn on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press (Osborn, Kathy)
August 28, 2019 Form AO 121 sent to the Copyright Office. (nal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Oregon Catholic Press. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
August 28, 2019 Spoke with Attorney Schmid regarding incomplete address on Farrel proposed summons. (nal)
August 28, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (nal)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3990011.), filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Attachments: #1 Supplement AO121 form for copyright infringement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet for copyright action, #3 Proposed Summons Oregon Catholic Press, #4 Proposed Summons Bernadette Farrell)(Schmid, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrosetti v. Oregon Catholic Press et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Catholic Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent A Ambrosetti
Represented By: Donald J Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?