Lamb Publications LLC et al v. Oregon Catholic Press
Plaintiff: Lamb Publications LLC, Vincent A Ambrosette and Vincent A Ambrosetti
Defendant: Oregon Catholic Press
Case Number: 3:2019cv00686
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Randolph C Foster PHV for Oregon Catholic Press. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/24/2019. (ace)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeremy D Sacks PHV for Oregon Catholic Press. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/24/2019. (ace)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Application for Attorney Jeremy D. Sacks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4043633(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/23/2019) (ace).
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 Application for Attorney Randolph C. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4043632(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/24/2019) (ace).
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Springer, Alice)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Oregon Catholic Press. (Springer, Alice)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 MOTION to Withdraw Appearances filed by Oregon Catholic Press. Attorney Kathy L Osborn; Ryan M Hurley and Matthew R Kinsman terminated.Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/2/19. (slm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw Appearances by Defendant Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew)
September 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines: per DE #12 - Oregon Catholic Press answer due by 10/22/19 (kjp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Oregon Catholic Press ; answer due by 10/22/2019. (Springer, Alice)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice J Springer on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press (Springer, Alice)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Kinsman on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press (Kinsman, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oregon Catholic Press. (Osborn, Kathy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Hurley on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press (Hurley, Ryan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy L Osborn on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press (Osborn, Kathy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND for antitrust violations against All Defendants, filed by Lamb Publications LLC, Vincent A Ambrosette.(Schmid, Donald)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Oregon Catholic Press. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Lamb Publications LLC. (Schmid, Donald)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Oregon Catholic Press. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
August 28, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. added. NEW CASE. (shk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Antitrust Violations against All Defendants, filed by Lamb Publications LLC, Vincent A Ambrosette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for antitrust action, #2 Proposed Summons for antitrust action)(Schmid, Donald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 *** INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED; RE-FILED AT DE #2 *** COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3990584.), filed by Lamb Publications LLC, Vincent A Ambrosette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for antitrust action, #2 Proposed Summons for antitrust action)(Schmid, Donald) Modified on 8/28/2019 (shk). Modified on 8/29/2019 to correct text (ksp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamb Publications LLC et al v. Oregon Catholic Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamb Publications LLC
Represented By: Donald J Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent A Ambrosette
Represented By: Donald J Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent A Ambrosetti
Represented By: Donald J Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Catholic Press
Represented By: Randolph C Foster PHV
Represented By: Jeremy D Sacks PHV
Represented By: Kathy L Osborn
Represented By: Alice J Springer
Represented By: Ryan M Hurley
Represented By: Matthew R Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?