Arnett v. Woodlawn Hospital
Plaintiff: Marqueta E. Arnett
Defendant: Woodlawn Hospital
Case Number: 3:2019cv00690
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fml
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by the plaintiff by 10/28/2019 and by the defendant by 11/27/2019. Discovery deadline is 4/21/2020. Expert Discovery deadline is 4/21/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 2/21/2020. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 1/21/2020. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/29/2019. The parties have agreed on R. John Kuehn as mediator. Mediation to be completed by 5/15/2020., Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/21/2020. The Court hereby VACATES the status conference set for October 29, 2019 at 11:30 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/25/19. (ksp)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Telephonically. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT may attend the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference telephonically on 10/29/2019.The court will call all counsel listed on the docket sheet unless it is notified that specified attorneys need not be contacted. If, at the time of the scheduled conference, you will not be at the telephone number identified on the docket please contact chambersApproved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/24/2019. (mlf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION To Appear Telephonically for PPTC by Plaintiff Marqueta E. Arnett. (Serrano, Cathy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Marqueta E. Arnett (Serrano, Cathy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE / Attorney Certification. (Myers, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schappa, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2019 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/19/19. (slm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Woodlawn Hospital.(Schappa, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry R Jensen, Jr on behalf of Woodlawn Hospital (Jensen, Larry)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Woodlawn Hospital. (Schappa, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Schappa on behalf of Woodlawn Hospital (Schappa, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3991799.) from Fulton Superior Court, Cause No. 25D01-1906-CT-000371, filed by Woodlawn Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings filed to date in State Court (Fulton County, Indiana), #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Plaintiff of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Clerk of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schappa, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnett v. Woodlawn Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodlawn Hospital
Represented By: Matthew M Schappa
Represented By: Larry R Jensen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marqueta E. Arnett
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?