The Art of Design, Inc. v. Sharpline Converting, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Art of Design, Inc.
Defendant: Sharpline Converting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00702
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Art of Design, Inc.. Sharpline Converting, Inc. served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Quinn, Sean)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sharpline Converting, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
August 30, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of The Art of Design, Inc. (LaDue, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Art of Design, Inc.. (Quinn, Sean)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J Quinn on behalf of The Art of Design, Inc. (Quinn, Sean)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sharpline Converting, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3993878.), filed by The Art of Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Shatter Graphic Certificates and Deposit Materials, #2 Exhibit B - Shatter Boat Certificates and Deposit Materials, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Supplement Form AO121)(Quinn, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Art of Design, Inc. v. Sharpline Converting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharpline Converting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Art of Design, Inc.
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?