Ray et al v. Raj Bedi Revocable Trust
Plaintiff: John Ray, C.F.B, Inc. and C.F.B. Real Estate Corp.
Defendant: Raj Bedi Revocable Trust
Case Number: 3:2019cv00711
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Hearing re #21 Response to Motion, to Remand by Defendant Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. (O'Connor, Felicia)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(O'Connor, Felicia)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Response to be filed by 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/31/19. (dk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. (O'Connor, Felicia)
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by C.F.B, Inc., C.F.B. Real Estate Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Slabaugh, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Complaint for Declaratory Relief Memorandum in Support of Response filed by John Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hicks, Andrew) Modified on 10/30/2019 to correct docket text (nae).
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by John Ray. (Hicks, Andrew)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The parties now have up to and including 10/29/19 to file their responses to the pending motions. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/21/19. (nal)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Plaintiffs C.F.B, Inc., C.F.B. Real Estate Corp.. (Shively, Bradford)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs C.F.B, Inc., C.F.B. Real Estate Corp., John Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Identifying Commercial Court Docket Case)(Shively, Bradford)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Irina N Kashcheyeva PHV for Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/1/2019. (ace)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Norman C Ankers PHV for Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/1/2019. (ace)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Attorney Irina N. Kashcheyeva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4021948(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Attorney Norman C. Ankers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4021887(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas J P Meros PHV for Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/27/2019. (ace)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Slabaugh on behalf of C.F.B, Inc., C.F.B. Real Estate Corp. (Slabaugh, Jonathan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Attorney Nicholas John Peter Meros to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4017931(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Michigan State Court Complaint (May 24, 2018), #3 Exhibit Cass County Circuit Courts May 6, 2019 Order, #4 Exhibit John Rays June 14, 2019 Letter Appointing Arbitrators, #5 Exhibit C.F.B., Inc. Buy-Sell Agreement, #6 Exhibit C.F.B. Real Estate Corp. Buy-Sell Agreement, #7 Exhibit John Rays October 2, 2017 Offer Letter, #8 Exhibit Michigan State Court Amended Complaint (November 20, 2018), #9 Exhibit Cass County Circuit Courts June 21, 2019 Order, #10 Exhibit Bedi Trusts Motion for Partial Summary Disposition (April 1, 2019), #11 Exhibit John Ray, CFB, and CFB Real Estates Objections to Proposed Order (September 4, 2019), #12 Exhibit Bedi Trusts Motion for Court Supervision (July 30, 2019), #13 Exhibit Bedi Trusts Proposed Order Regarding Motion for Court Supervision, #14 Exhibit Ray, CFB, and CFB Real Estates Complaint for Declaratory Relief (August 7, 2019), #15 Exhibit Cass County Circuit Courts July 25, 2019 Opinion and Order, #16 Exhibit Excerpts from John Rays Motion for Summary Disposition of Amended Complaint (March 6, 2019))(O'Connor, Felicia)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Defendant Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. (O'Connor, Felicia)
September 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 9/24/2019 per #3 Agreed Notice. (jld)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Raj Bedi Revocable Trust ; answer due by 9/24/2019. (O'Connor, Felicia)
September 4, 2019 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3996332.) from Elkhart Superior Court 2, Cause No. 20D02-1908-PL-000201, filed by Raj Bedi Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint for Declaratory Relief in Elkhart Superior Court 2, #2 Exhibit Summons for Elkhart Superior Court 2, #3 Exhibit Bedi's Affidavit to Motion for Partial Summary Disposition, #4 Exhibit Ray's October 13 Offer Letter, #5 Exhibit Bedi's December 7, 2017 Offer Letter)(O'Connor, Felicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. Raj Bedi Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ray
Represented By: Andrew M Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.F.B, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford R Shively
Represented By: Jonathan R Slabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.F.B. Real Estate Corp.
Represented By: Bradford R Shively
Represented By: Jonathan R Slabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raj Bedi Revocable Trust
Represented By: Felicia S O'Connor
Represented By: Norman C Ankers PHV
Represented By: Irina N Kashcheyeva PHV
Represented By: Nicholas J P Meros PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?