Berlincourt v. University of Notre Dame
Plaintiff: Lisa L. Berlincourt and Lisa Berlincourt
Defendant: University of Notre Dame
Case Number: 3:2019cv00731
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Court GRANTS #12 Joint Motion to Attend Pretrial Conference by Telephone. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 9:30 AM will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Rodovich's case manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours in advance. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/7/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Lisa Berlincourt. (Myers, Christopher)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by University of Notre Dame.(Hollis, Edward)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/22/2019. (tc)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM in US District Court, Hammond Division before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/1/2019. (tc)
October 9, 2019 Set Deadline: Answer due 11/7/2019 per #8 Agreed Notice. (jld)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by University of Notre Dame ; answer due by 11/07/2019. (Hollis, Edward)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/7/2019. (tc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah V Bowers on behalf of University of Notre Dame (Bowers, Sarah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward E Hollis on behalf of University of Notre Dame (Hollis, Edward)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr recused. Case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich for the purpose of conducting all non-dispositive pretrial proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and the General Orders of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/16/19. (kjp)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to University of Notre Dame. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
September 11, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE (kjp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Lisa L. Berlincourt (Serrano, Cathy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against University of Notre Dame( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4002676.), filed by Lisa L. Berlincourt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (COD), #2 Exhibit B (NORTS), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Myers, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berlincourt v. University of Notre Dame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Notre Dame
Represented By: Edward E Hollis
Represented By: Sarah V Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa L. Berlincourt
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Berlincourt
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?