Eppenger v. South Bend Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Eppenger
Defendant: City of South Bend, Indiana, South Bend Police Department and South Bend City of
Case Number: 3:2019cv00749
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: A scheduling conference is hereby set for Thursday, 12/19/2019 at 9:00 AM EDT in the third-floor courtroom. The parties are directed to prepare and submit a brief joint status report on or before 12/12/2019 informing the Court of what is outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/28/2019. (jat)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Hays on behalf of South Bend City of, South Bend Police Department (Hays, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court now ADOPTS the parties discovery plan andestablishes the following deadlines: Pre-Discovery Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/29/2019. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 4/30/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts are due from plaintiff(s) by 12/31/2019, and from defendants by 1/28/2020. The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 11/15/2019. Deadline to file any dispositive motions is 5/29/2020. This case is now set for a telephonic scheduling conference before the HonorableMichael G. Gotsch, Sr. on 3/31/2020 at 11:00 A.M. (South Bend time). Order finding MOOT the Plaintiffs Motion to Appear Telephonically for the Rule 16Preliminary Pretrial Conference #10 . The Court hereby VACATES the status conference for 10/31/2019 at 11:15 A.M. (EDT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/21/2019. (shk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Terrance Eppenger. (Pleasants, Larry)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Klesmith, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm) Modified on 9/19/2019 (slm). Copy mailed to plaintiffcnsl
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 11:15 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/19/19. (slm) CC Pleasants; Modified on 9/19/2019 (slm).
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by South Bend City of, South Bend Police Department.(Klesmith, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Klesmith on behalf of South Bend Police Department (Klesmith, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 **NEW CASE** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nae)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid: $ 400, receipt number 0755-4006810 (jld)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Joseph County Superior Court, Cause No. 71D05-1908-CT-000333, filed by City of South Bend, Indiana, South Bend Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Klesmith, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Klesmith on behalf of City of South Bend, Indiana, South Bend Police Department (Klesmith, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eppenger v. South Bend Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of South Bend, Indiana
Represented By: Elizabeth A Klesmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bend Police Department
Represented By: Elizabeth A Klesmith
Represented By: Michael J Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bend City of
Represented By: Elizabeth A Klesmith
Represented By: Michael J Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Eppenger
Represented By: Larry W Pleasants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?