Stoett Industries, Inc. et al v. Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stoett Industries, Inc. and Newline International, LLC
Defendant: Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00835
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01104. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting Motion to change/transfer venue (Related Doc #7 )to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. Judge James G. Carr on 9/19/19.(C,D) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Nicholas A. Huckaby filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Huckaby, Nicholas) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 Reply in support of #7 Motion to dismiss or alternativelyMotion to transfer to Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division filed by Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.. (Springer, Alice) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Alice J Springer for Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge James G. Carr on 8/14/19.(C,D) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney D. Randall Brown for Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #10 ). Judge James G. Carr on 8/14/19.(C,D) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition to #7 Motion to dismiss or alternativelyMotion to transfer to Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit photos)(Strup, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Alice J. Springer to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification from the Supreme Court of Indiana. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9464610, filed by Defendant Irvine Shade & Door, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clagg, Jason) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for attorney D. Randall Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice. With Certification from the Supreme Court of Indiana. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9464582, filed by Defendant Irvine Shade & Door, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clagg, Jason) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Initial Status Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JUDGECARR_CHAMBERS@OHND.USCOURTS.GOV prior to the date of conference. Related document(s) #1 . (C,EA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Case Management Notice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support of its {7] Motion to Dismiss, Or Alternatively, to Transfer filed by Irvine Shade & Door, Inc. Related document(s) #7 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Nicholas Donis) (Clagg, Jason) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (M,L). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss or alternatively Motion to transfer to Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division filed by Defendant Irvine Shade & Door, Inc. (Clagg, Jason). Added Motion on 7/18/2019 (M,L). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.. (Clagg, Jason) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Jason T. Clagg filed by on behalf of Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.. (Clagg, Jason) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stoett Industries, Inc.. (Strup, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Stoett Industries, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Irvine Shade & Door, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (R,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9312830.. Filed by Stoett Industries, Inc., Newline International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Patent, #4 Exhibit B - Assignment, #5 Exhibit C - License Agreement, #6 Exhibit D - Photos-Stoett, #7 Exhibit E - Photos-Slow Roll) (Strup, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoett Industries, Inc. et al v. Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stoett Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Strup
Represented By: Michael E Dockins
Represented By: Nicholas A. Huckaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newline International, LLC
Represented By: David P. Strup
Represented By: Michael E Dockins
Represented By: Nicholas A. Huckaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvine Shade & Door, Inc.
Represented By: Jason T Clagg
Represented By: Alice J Springer
Represented By: D Randall Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?