Hardy v. Lott et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Hardy
Defendant: Lieutenant Lott, Lieutenant Lasco, Sergeant Radats and Lieutenant Neal
Case Number: 3:2019cv00956
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Marcus Hardy in response to #3 Order requesting extension of time (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nae)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Marcus Hardy until 12/23/2019 to resolve his filing fee status and CAUTIONING Marcus Hardy that if he does not respond by that deadline this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/21/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Marcus Hardy requesting additional copy of docket sheet (docket sheet sent) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nae)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Lieutenant Lasco, Lieutenant Lott, Lieutenant Neal, Sergeant Radats (INITIAL PARTIAL Filing fee $ 5.00) Receipt #3023502, filed by Marcus Hardy. (Hardy states address of prison is Indiana State Prison, complaint mailed from Wallens Ridge State Prison Big Stone Gap, VA) (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Wallens) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Lott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Lasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Radats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?