Simbeck v. Indiana State Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Rocky Dwight Simbeck
Defendant: J. Faulstich, Ducomb Center St. Joseph Community Corrections, Indiana State Police Department, South Bend Police Department and David Coswell
Case Number: 3:2019cv01035
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7019 0700 0000 3512 4306) (bas)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING case as abandoned pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/6/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7019 0700 0000 3512 4306)(bas)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned from Rocky Dwight Simbeck as Undeliverable (Not in Custody, Released) re #9 Order to Show Cause. (shk)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Rocky Dwight Simbeck is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by 1/3/20 why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/16/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned from Rocky Dwight Simbeck as Undeliverable - Released 11/7/2019 re: copy of docket sheet with INND case number (nae)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court ORDERS the plaintiff, Rocky Dwight Simbeck, IDOC # Unknown, Saint Joseph Jail # 122799, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $47.15 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/19/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04313. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana - South Bend, on October 25, 2019. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana - Based on the foregoing, this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, at South Bend. The pending motion in this case remains pending for disposition by the Northern District of Indiana. The clerk is directed to terminate the pending motion on this docket (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/25/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ROCKY DWIGHT SIMBECK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Exhibit Account Summary) (AKH).[Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/13/2019.] Modified on 11/13/2019 to reopen motion(nae).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID COSWELL, DUCOMB CENTER ST. JOSEPH COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS, INDIANA STATE POLICE DEPARTMENT, SOUTH BEND POLICE DEPARTMENT and J. FAULSTICH, filed by ROCKY DWIGHT SIMBECK. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 DOJ USM Form 285, #3 Envelope)(AKH) Modified on 10/25/2019 (AKH). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simbeck v. Indiana State Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Faulstich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducomb Center St. Joseph Community Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bend Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Coswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Dwight Simbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?