Cawvey et al v. Kal Freight Inc et al
Plaintiff: Melonie Cawvey and Christopher Cawvey
Defendant: Kal Freight Inc and Hassan Suleiman Farah
Not Yet Classified: Kevin Fitzharris
Case Number: 3:2019cv01076
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/17/2020before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla appeared by atty Blackburn. Dft appeared by atty Strawbridge. Kevin FItzharris appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. Any amendments to the pleadings by plf to be filed by 03/03/2020; defendant to be filed by 3/10/2020. Discovery/Fact/Discovery deadline is 11/20/2020 Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 7/21/2020. The last date to file anydiscovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline.Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 8/21/2020. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/3/2020. Mediation to be completed by 11/30/2020. Dispositive motions to be filed by 12/20/2020, Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/7/2020. (slm)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT may attend the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference telephonically on 1/17/2020.The court will call all counsel listed on the docket sheet unless it is notified that specified attorneys need not be contacted. If, at the time of the scheduled conference, you will not be at the telephone number identified on the docket please contact chambers. Approve by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 01/14/2020. (mlf)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiffs Christopher Cawvey, Melonie Cawvey. (Blackburn, Thomas)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE Attorney Client Certification. (Blackburn, Thomas)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The court GRANTS the motion to withdraw the motion to remand #15 and ORDERS the motion to remand #11 shown as WITHDRAWN. The court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case.. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/8/2020. (shk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Christopher Cawvey, Melonie Cawvey. (Singleton, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Singleton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singleton, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blackburn, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kal Freight Inc, Hassan Suleiman Farah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail string)(English, Katherine)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 **WITHDRAWN per #16 Order** MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Christopher Cawvey, Melonie Cawvey. (Blackburn, Thomas) Modified on 1/9/2020 to update docket text (shk).
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/6/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2020 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/16/19. (slm)
November 21, 2019 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kal Freight Inc. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kal Freight Inc, Hassan Suleiman Farah. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L English on behalf of All Defendants (English, Katherine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S Strawbridge on behalf of All Defendants (Strawbridge, Katherine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4071499.) from Elkhart County Circuit Court, Cause No. 20C01-1905-CT-000096, filed by Hassan Suleiman Farah, Kal Freight Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record (Appearance, Complaint, Summons (2), COS, Appearance, Jury Demand, MET, POS, Order, Answer, Notice of Selection of Mediator, Alias Summons, Notice of Substitution of Mediator, POS, Answer))(Strawbridge, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cawvey et al v. Kal Freight Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melonie Cawvey
Represented By: David A Singleton
Represented By: Thomas D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cawvey
Represented By: David A Singleton
Represented By: Thomas D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kal Freight Inc
Represented By: Katherine L English
Represented By: Katherine S Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassan Suleiman Farah
Represented By: Katherine L English
Represented By: Katherine S Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Kevin Fitzharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?