Taylor v. Indiana Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Greg Taylor
Defendant: Brian Bertsch, Robert Carter, Jr, Wexford LLC, Ellen Karis, Unknown, Indiana Department of Corrections and Mark Levenhagen
Case Number: 3:2019cv01155
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03042. Original file and docket sheet received.
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on 12/05/19. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLOSED - Order Transferring Action to the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division - On screening Mr. Taylor's complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the Court discerns that Mr. Taylor is bringing suit against Indiana Department of Corrections officials and Wexford Health Services employees at the Miami Correctional Facility in Bunker Hill, Indiana, concerning events that happened there in May and June 2019. Thus venue for this action is more properly brought in the South Bend Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana. Accordingly, this action is now TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/5/2019.(NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RECEIPT #IP066838 for partial filing fee in the amount of $2.67, paid by plaintiff. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order - Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff Greg Taylor's motion to extend the deadline for payment of the assessed initial partial filing fee, dkt. #11 , is granted. The initial partial filing fee shall be paid no later than October 21, 2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/20/2019. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff GREG TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order - Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff Greg Taylor has submitted a statement of transactions of his inmate trust account as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915. Dkt. #9 . Accordingly, his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), an initial partial filing fee of two dollars and sixty-seven cents ($2.67) is assessed and shall be paid to the clerk of the district court no later than September 20, 2019. Although Mr. Taylor is excused from pre-paying the full filing fee, he still must pay the three hundred and fifty dollar ($350.00) filing fee pursuant to the statutory formula set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b) (2) when able. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/27/2019. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXHIBIT (Certification of Inmate Trust Fund Account) in Support of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREG TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt 6 - Notice of Deficiency, #2 Envelope)(NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. (JRT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court filed by Plaintiff GREG TAYLOR (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CBU) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through September 3, 2019, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (JRT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel, dkt. #3 , is denied as premature. The filing fee issue has not been resolved, the complaint has not been screened, and the defendants have not been served. In addition, litigants requesting that counsel be recruited must first show that they made a reasonable attempt to secure private counsel. The clerk shall include a copy of the Court's form Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry. The plaintiff shall use this form for any future requests for counsel. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/30/2019. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff GREG TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff GREG TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN BERTSCH, ROBERT CARTER, JR, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, ELLEN KARIS, MARK LEVENHAGEN, UNKNOWN, WEXFORD LLC, filed by GREG TAYLOR. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope).(MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Indiana Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bertsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Karis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Levenhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?