Pierre et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wanda Pierre and Jesse Pierre
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Not Classified By Court: Nadine Gills
Case Number: 3:2020cv00075
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Gasper, Trevor)
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00628. Original file and docket sheet received.
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULING and ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case. Case transferred to District of Northern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/3/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #4 Motion to Transfer Case to the Norther District of Indiana, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 is CANCELED. No status report is due. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Removing Defendant and List of Documents Included in the State Court Record Exhibit(s) to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Petition Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit - Correspondence to East Baton Rouge Parish, #3 Exhibit - Citation Served on Thor through Corporation Service Company, #4 Exhibit - Correspondence to East Baton Rouge Parish, #5 Exhibit - Citation Served on Thor through CT Corporation)(Domingue, Lamont) Modified on 10/9/2019 to edit text(LT). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mark Stanley, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Attachment Certificate of Conference)(Domingue, Lamont) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2019 to edit page orientation) (LT). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/25/2019. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Nadine Gill who is lead counsel for party Jesse Pierre and Wanda Pierre. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-681526 Sec. 23. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2003561), filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - State Court Pleadings served on Thor, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal to East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court & Counsel, #3 Attachment 3 - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Counsel List, #5 Exhibit 5 - Verification, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Mark Stanley)(Domingue, Lamont) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/20/2019 to edit page orientation) (LT). Modified on 9/20/2019 (LT). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/24/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Thor Motor Coach Inc, filed by Jesse Pierre, Wanda Pierre.(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierre et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Pierre
Represented By: Nadine Gills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Pierre
Represented By: Nadine Gills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Nadine Gills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?