Minnix et al v. Song
Plaintiff: Wenilyn Minnix and Dwayne Minnix
Defendant: Hui Song
Case Number: 3:2020cv00321
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/29/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2020 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Dial in instructions to be provided to the parties listed on the docket by email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/9/20. (slm)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant Hui Song's ANSWER to Complaint by Hui Song.(Brown, Timothy)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle B Lawrence on behalf of Hui Song (Lawrence, Kyle)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hui Song answer due 6/8/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/1/20. (cck)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Hui Song. (Brown, Timothy) Modified dkt text to indicate agreed, on 5/1/2020 (kjp).
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J Brown on behalf of Hui Song (Brown, Timothy)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hui Song. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hui Song. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons filed by Dwayne Minnix, Wenilyn Minnix. (Worthley, Tara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2020: #1 Proposed Alias Summons) (shk). Modified on 4/29/2020 to updated docket text and attach corrected document(shk).
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Alias Summons filed by Dwayne Minnix, Wenilyn Minnix. (Worthley, Tara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2020: #1 Proposed Alias Summons) (shk). Modified on 4/29/2020 to updated docket text and attach corrected document (shk).
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hui Song. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Dwayne Minnix and Wenilyn Minnix. (Worthley, Tara) Modified on 4/16/2020 to modify docket text to include other plaintiff (shk).
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Dwayne Minnix and Wenilyn Minnix. (Worthley, Tara) Modified on 4/16/2020 to modify docket text to include other plaintiff(shk).
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara M Worthley on behalf of Dwayne Minnix and Wenilyn Minnix (Worthley, Tara) Modified on 4/16/2020 to correct docket text to add second plaintiff Wenilyn Minnix. Appearance states Hammond, but case is a South Bend matter (shk).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hui Song( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4201184.), filed by Dwayne Minnix and Wenilyn Minnix. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver)(Worthley, Tara) Modified on 4/16/2020 to correct docket text to add second plaintiff Wenilyn Minnix and to correct #2 attachment). (shk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnix et al v. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hui Song
Represented By: Kyle B Lawrence
Represented By: Timothy J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenilyn Minnix
Represented By: Tara M Worthley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Minnix
Represented By: Tara M Worthley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?