Williams v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Kyle F Williams
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00343
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 On courts own motion the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is reset for 7/28/2020 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/9/20. (slm)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/29/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2020 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Dial-in instructions to be provided to the parties by email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/8/20. (slm)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Duffey, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Duffey, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Duffey, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Duffey on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Duffey, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L Emenhiser on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Emenhiser, Heather)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
April 30, 2020 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Wilensky on behalf of Kyle F Williams (Wilensky, Benjamin)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Norfolk Southern Railway Company( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4213634.), filed by Kyle F Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Pearlman, Arvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Heather L Emenhiser
Represented By: John C Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle F Williams
Represented By: Benjamin J Wilensky
Represented By: Arvin J Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?