Summitt v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Curtis L. Summitt
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00443
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Gasper, Trevor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Gasper, Trevor)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Curtis L. Summitt. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Dalton, Richard)
June 3, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Thor Motor Coach, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4242619.), filed by Curtis L. Summitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summitt v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis L. Summitt
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?