Waisganis v. Greer
Plaintiff: Cindy Waisganis
Defendant: Susan Greer
Case Number: 3:2020cv00475
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 8/20/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 11:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/4/20. (slm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages, Jury Demand and Affirmative Defensens by Susan Greer.(Lawrence, Kyle)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Susan Greer answer due 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/2/20. (ksp)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Susan Greer. (Lawrence, Kyle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle B Lawrence on behalf of Susan Greer (Lawrence, Kyle)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeff A Saltzman PHV for Cindy Waisganis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/16/2020. (ace)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Attorney Jeff A. Saltzman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cindy Waisganis; Pro Hac Vice fee of $96 has been received, Receipt INN#3024856. (ace)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Susan Greer. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT at Law against Susan Greer (Filing fee $ 400.) Receipt #3024857, filed by Cindy Waisganis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waisganis v. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Waisganis
Represented By: Jeff A Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?