Jordan v. Bergerson et al
Plaintiff: Ledon Timothy Jordan
Defendant: Michael S Bergerson and Mark Roala
Case Number: 3:2020cv00499
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The court ORDERS Ledon Timothy Jordan to show cause by 9/4/2020, as to why this case should not be dismissed for not promptly notifying the court of his new address; and CAUTIONS him that, if he does not respond by that deadline, this case may be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/5/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned from Ledon Timothy Jordan as Undeliverable - #4 Order Directing Prisoner Payment,,,, Terminate Motions,,,. (unable to forward) (mlc)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) filed by Ledon Timothy Jordan. The Court ORDERS the plaintiff, Ledon Timothy Jordan, IDOC # 252993, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $18.23 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/6/20. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(ksp)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to CLOSE case 1:20cv217 and OPEN a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/17/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Ledon Timothy Jordan. (lhc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Michael S Bergerson, Mark Roala, filed by Ledon Timothy Jordan. (lhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Bergerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Bergerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Roala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledon Timothy Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?