Float-On Corporation v. Paul's Marine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Float-On Corporation
Defendant: Paul E. Myers, Jr., Paul's Marine, Inc. d/b/a PMI Marine Distributors and Paul's Marine, Inc. An Indiana Corporation doing business as PMI Marine Distributors
Case Number: 3:2020cv00562
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' answers due 9/20/20 per DE 16 . (kjp)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 09/20/20 as to All Defendants. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/24/20. (slm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by Defendants Paul E. Myers, Jr., Paul's Marine, Inc.. (Slabaugh, Jonathan)
July 21, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Paul E. Myers and Paul's Marine Inc's answers due by 8/25/2020 per #14 . (lhc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Paul E. Myers, Jr., Paul's Marine, Inc. ; answer due by August 25, 2020. (Slabaugh, Jonathan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul's Marine, Inc.. (Slabaugh, Jonathan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Slabaugh on behalf of Paul E. Myers, Jr., Paul's Marine, Inc. (Slabaugh, Jonathan)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian B Darville PHV for Float-On Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/14/2020. (ace)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 Application for Attorney BRIAN BERNARD DARVILLE to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of FLOAT-ON CORPORATION. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4279893(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/14/2020 to include corrected party represented) (ace). Modified on 7/14/2020 (ace).
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul E. Myers, Jr., Paul's Marine, Inc., filed by Float-On Corporation.(Hanig, Erin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Float-On Corporation re 7 Docket Annotation re Submission of AO 120 Form (Hanig, Erin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 Advised Attorney Erin Linder Hanig of request for AO 120 Trademark form. (mrm)
July 2, 2020 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Paul E. Myers, Jr., Paul's Marine, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J VeNard on behalf of Float-On Corporation (VeNard, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M Curran on behalf of Float-On Corporation (Curran, Timothy)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Float-On Corporation. (Hanig, Erin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Float-On Corporation (Hanig, Erin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Float-On Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4269411.), filed by Float-On Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hanig, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Float-On Corporation v. Paul's Marine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Myers, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan R Slabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul's Marine, Inc. d/b/a PMI Marine Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul's Marine, Inc. An Indiana Corporation doing business as PMI Marine Distributors
Represented By: Jonathan R Slabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Float-On Corporation
Represented By: Timothy M Curran
Represented By: Daniel J VeNard
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Brian B Darville PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?