Cunningham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Cunningham
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00570
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/2/2020. (slm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Ricky A Cunningham. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/27/2020. US Attorney General served on 7/27/2020. US Attorney served on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (jld)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (Copy mailed to USM) (mrm)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/8/2020. (Copy mailed to USM)(mrm)
July 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE - PENDING IFP MOTION) (mrm)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Fisher on behalf of Ricky A. Cunningham (Fisher, Jennifer)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (28 U.S.C. 1915) by Plaintiff Ricky A. Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM 285)(Fisher, Jennifer)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ricky A. Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fisher, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Cunningham
Represented By: Jennifer L Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?