Stanford et al v. Lowe's Home Center LLC
Plaintiff: Deborah Stanford and Leonard Stanford
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers Inc and Lowe's Home Center LLC
Not Classified By Court: Hon. Michael P Scopelitis
Case Number: 3:2020cv00582
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court now ADOPTS the parties discovery plan as outlined below and establishes the following deadlines: The parties stipulate out of the mandatory initial disclosures. The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 1/13/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 6/13/2021; and from defendant(s) by 7/28/2021. The last date for the completion of all discovery is 10/13/2021. The last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. The parties have agreed upon Hon. Michael Scopelitis as mediator. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 4/13/2021. The Court hereby VACATES the scheduling conference for 8/27/2020 at 11:45 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/17/2020. (bas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Lowe's Home Center LLC Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Slusher, Jordan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 8/12/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 11:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/29/20. (slm)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Center LLC.(Slusher, Jordan)
July 15, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (kjp)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Lowes Home Centers Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Removal Notice in the LaPorte County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice to Plaintiffs and Clerk)(Slusher, Jordan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowes Home Centers Inc. (Slusher, Jordan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Wroblewski on behalf of Lowes Home Centers Inc (Wroblewski, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M Slusher on behalf of Lowes Home Centers Inc (Slusher, Jordan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4279929.) from LaPorte, Cause No. 46D02-2006-CT-000787, filed by Lowes Home Centers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice to Clerk and Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings)(Slusher, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford et al v. Lowe's Home Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Stanford
Represented By: Jeffrey J Stesiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Stanford
Represented By: Jeffrey J Stesiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers Inc
Represented By: Jordan M Slusher
Represented By: Michael Wroblewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Center LLC
Represented By: Jordan M Slusher
Represented By: Michael Wroblewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. Michael P Scopelitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?