Streeting v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: William A Streeting
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00594
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/8/2020. (tc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo William A Streeting. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (shk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (bas)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTING, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/17/2020. (cc: USMS) (bas)
July 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE; Motion pending. (jat)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Fisher on behalf of William A Streeting (Fisher, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (28 U.S.C. 1915) by Plaintiff William A Streeting. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM 285)(Fisher, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by William A Streeting. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fisher, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streeting v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Streeting
Represented By: Jennifer L Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?