Johnson v. Warden
Petitioner: Michael Johnson
Respondent: Warden
Not Classified By Court: PUTNAMVILLE E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00600
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 3025331 (kms)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Michael Johnson. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Michael Johnson regarding change of address (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Address previously updated per DE #2 )(kms) Modified on 8/13/2020 copy of DE #1 sent to Putnamville address)(nae).
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Johnson from Miami Correctional Facility to Putnamville Correctional Facility per DE #2 returned mail. (kms)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Mail Returned from Michael Johnson as Undeliverable re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and docket sheet - transferred to Putnamville Correctional Facility (Indiana State Farm) - Resent to Putnamville (kms) Modified on 8/6/2020 to edit docket text(kms).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Johnson. (No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned file stamped copy to Johnson with case number) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PUTNAMVILLE E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?