Freeman v Carter et al
Plaintiff: Vernell Freeman
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana LLC, Rob Carter, John Does 1-50, Mark Sevier, John Roes 1-50, William Hyatte, Katie Miller, Nicholas Harris, Roberta J Gwillim, Buford Nice, Sherri L Swearingen, Elliot Corner, Chad Smith, Nathanael D Angle, Lynette L Lees, Lynn Frye, Kyrstal Sharp, Corey L Elzbeck, Alder S Candia, Lirot, Stewart McVay, Joshua Snow, Angel B Mercier, Jenny L McKinney, Sandy M Roth, Shannon M McKinney, Book, Katelynn L Crull, Trevor Heishman, James R Cattin, James Williams, Janice H Smith, Brenda Denny, Michelle M Bridges, Chad C Crites, Shawna Morson, Vernia L Fanning, Jacqueline Scaife, Debra L Templin, Joyce Holland, Jennifer L Kersey, Warr, Vicky McFatridge, Jennie R Camblin, R Stafford, Tracy Overmeyer, Nathan Bates, Andru Sams, Kimberly Myers, Caleb Nelson, Mia Porter, Wendy K Arnold, D Mygrant, C. R., Annette Jones, David Wolfe, Kourtney B Burrus, Lori Hazlett, Dorie L Yocum, Matthew S Morson, Carol Perkins, Jennifer Fiscal, Latta, Lee Ann Ivers, Pamela G Cool, M Schoettmer, Courtney R Bridenthall, Matthew Huffman, Ashley O Wilson, Workman, Jennifer L Austin, Irma B Moore, Kim E Penrod and Nikkie Neal
Case Number: 3:2020cv00631
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Summons Issued as to Wendy K Arnold. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information For Plaintiff's Counsel (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Summons Issued as to Candia Alder, Nathanael Angle, Jennifer Austin, Nathan Bates, Officer Book, Courtney Bridenthall, Michelle Bridges, Kourtney Burrus, jennie Camblin, James Cattin, Pamela Cool, Elliot Corner, Chad Crites, Jennifer Crull, Brenda Denny, Corey Elzbeck, Vernia Fanning, Jennifer Fiscal, Vernell Freeman, Lynn Frye, Roberta Gwillim, Nicholas Harris, Lori Hazlett, Trevor Heishman, Matthew Huffman, Annette Jones, Officer Latta, Lynette Lees, Linot, CNA, Vicky McFatridge, Jenny McKinney, Stewart McVay, Angel Mercier, Katie Miller, Irma Moore, Matthew Morson, Shawna Morson, Kimberly Myers, D Mygrant, Nikkie Neal, Caleb Nelson, Buford Nice, Tracy Overmeyer, Carol Perkins, Mia Porter, C. R., Sandy Roth, Andru Sams, M Schoettmer, Krystal Sharp, Chad Smith, Janice Smith, Joshua Snow, R Stafford, Sherri L Swearingen, Officer Warr, James Williams, Ashley Wilson, David Wolfe, Sgt Workman, Dorie Yocum, joyce holland, lee ann ivers, jennifer kersey, shannon mckinney, kim penrod, jacqueline scaife, Debra templin. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Wexford of Indiana LLC, Angel Mercier, Courtney Bridenthall, Debra templin, Dorie Yocum, Janice Smith, Jennifer Austin, Jennifer Crull, kim penrod, Kimberly Myers, Lynn Frye, Roberta Gwillim, Sherri L Swearingen, joyce holland, jacqueline scaife, James Williams, Jennifer Fiscal, Katie Miller, James Cattin, Kourtney Burrus, Michelle Bridges, Vernia Fanning, shannon mckinney, Nathan Bates, Ashley Wilson, Candia Alder, Chad Crites, Corey Elzbeck, Irma Moore, jennie Camblin, jennifer kersey, lee ann ivers, Pamela Cool, Sandy Roth, Annette Jones, Jenny McKinney, Lynette Lees, Vicky McFatridge, Tracy Overmeyer, Linot, CNA, C. R., M Schoettmer, Nathanael Angle, Chad Smith, Joshua Snow, Matthew Morson, Nikkie Neal, Brenda Denny, Officer Book, Caleb Nelson, Carol Perkins, David Wolfe, Elliot Corner, Krystal Sharp, Lori Hazlett, Matthew Huffman, Stewart McVay, R Stafford, Buford Nice, Nicholas Harris, Trevor Heishman, Shawna Morson, Mia Porter, Officer Warr, Sgt Workman, D Mygrant, Officer Latta, Andru Sams, filed by Vernell Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tort Claim Notice, #2 Exhibit Certified Green Cards)(Ponist, Rachelle)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECLARATION OF INABILITY to file Second Amended Complaint in a timely manner by Vernell Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Example of September 18, 2020 loading screen, #2 Exhibit Example of weekend error screen)(Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 **DUPLICATE OF #86 ** Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle) Modified on 9/21/2020 (shk).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Proposed Summons filed by Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the unopposed #45 , #49 Motions for Extension of Time to File Response to the pending Motions to Dismiss. The Responses are now due 9/18/2020. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by 9/18/2020. Text only entry by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 9/2/2020. (jss)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 Memorandum in Support, #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier re #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 Memorandum in Support, #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Carothers, Brandon)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M Carothers on behalf of Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier (Carothers, Brandon)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 Memorandum in Support, #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Roes 1-50, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 Memorandum in Support, #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Vernell Freeman. (Ponist, Rachelle)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mollie A Slinker terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/21/20. (slm)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mollie A. Slinker by Defendants Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier. (Slinker, Mollie)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Preliminary Witness List/Exhibit List by Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier. (Slinker, Mollie)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/19/2020. before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla appeared by atty Ponist. Dft appeared by atty Slinker; VanTyle. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 9/18/2020. Discovery deadline is 8/30/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/29/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/29/2021. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 8/6/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/9/2021 11:15 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/9/2020. (slm)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Preliminary Witness List/Exhibit List by John Roes 1-50, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (VanTyle, Emily)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason H Seitz on behalf of Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier (Seitz, Jason)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support of #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Roes 1-50, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants John Roes 1-50, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Benton on behalf of John Roes 1-50, Wexford of Indiana LLC (Benton, Thomas)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint filed by Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier. (Slinker, Mollie)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint by Defendants Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier. (Slinker, Mollie)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference in this case scheduled for 8/18/2020 is vacated and CONTINUED to 8/19/2020 to begin at 11:30 AM. All other provisions contained in the Court's scheduling Order #30 , remain otherwise in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/10/2020. (bas)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Continue Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendants Rob Carter, William Hyatte, Mark Sevier. (Slinker, Mollie)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/3/20. (slm)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01276. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana - South Bend Divison. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana - South Bend Divison, on July 27,2020. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CLOSED - ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA: On July 13, 2020, the Court directed the parties to show cause why this matter should not be transferred to the Northern District of Indiana. Dkt. 19. The defendants have no objection, see dkts. 20, 23, and the plaintiff did not respond in the time provided. The plaintiff has filed an amended complaint, dkt. 21, but it does not add parties, claims, or allegations that change the considerations set out in the order to show cause. Accordingly, this action is transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. This Court issues no ruling on the motions to dismiss at dkts. #10 and #16 . Following, the clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions on this Court's docket. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/27/2020. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court, sua sponte, hereby VACATES the Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). (Dkt. #18 .) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/27/2020. (GD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order *NEW TRANSFER CASE* Motions #10 and #16 pending. (jat)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff VERNELL FREEMAN . (Ponist, Rachelle) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE (State Defendants), re #19 Order to Show CauseTerminate Motions, filed by Defendants ROB CARTER, WILLIAM HYATTE, MARK SEVIER. (Slinker, Mollie) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff VERNELL FREEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ponist, Rachelle) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by VERNELL FREEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tort Claim Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tort Claim Notice Green Cards)(Ponist, Rachelle) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE to Court Regarding No Objection to Transferring this Matter to the Northern District of Indiana, filed by Defendants JOHN ROES, 150, WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC, re #19 Order to Show CauseTerminate Motions. (VanTyle, Emily) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA - Plaintiff Vernell Freeman's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the defendants' motion to dismiss, dkt. #13 , is GRANTED. Mr. Freeman shall have through July 20, 2020, to file a response or an amended complaint. Both parties shall also have through July 24, 2020, to show cause why this action should not be transferred to the Northern District of Indiana. The complaint indicates that all defendants but Indiana Department of Correction Commissioner Rob Carter reside in the Northern District. See 28 U.S.C. 1391 (b), 1404. Additionally, the complaint describes all events as occurring at Miami Correctional Facility, which is in the Northern District. As such, the Court infers that any defendants added in an amended complaint are likely to reside in the Northern District. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/13/2020. (DWH) Modified on 7/14/2020 (CBU). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed CMP on or before 7/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/7/2020.(CBU) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants JOHN ROES, 150, WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC. (VanTyle, Emily) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants JOHN ROES, 150, WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Wexford Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(VanTyle, Emily)[Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kathleen VanTyle on behalf of Defendant JOHN ROES, 150. (VanTyle, Emily) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Terese Gilbert on behalf of Defendant JOHN ROES, 150. (Gilbert, Heather) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 07/14/2020 re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff VERNELL FREEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ponist, Rachelle) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC identifying Corporate Parent BANTRY GROUP CORPORATION for WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC.. (VanTyle, Emily) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants ROB CARTER, WILLIAM HYATTE, MARK SEVIER. (Slinker, Mollie) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants ROB CARTER, WILLIAM HYATTE, MARK SEVIER. (Slinker, Mollie) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie Ann Slinker on behalf of Defendants ROB CARTER, WILLIAM HYATTE, MARK SEVIER. (Slinker, Mollie) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant Wexford of Indiana, LLC's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/29/2020. (SWM) Modified on 6/1/2020 (SWM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 8, 2020 in which to #1 Complaint Answer or File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Wexford's Motion for Extension of Time)(VanTyle, Emily) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kathleen VanTyle on behalf of Defendant WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC. (VanTyle, Emily) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Terese Gilbert on behalf of Defendant WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC. (Gilbert, Heather) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROB CARTER, JOHN DOES 1-50, WILLIAM HYATTE, JOHN ROES, 150, MARK SEVIER, WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle N. Ponist on behalf of Plaintiff VERNELL FREEMAN. (Ponist, Rachelle) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by VERNELL FREEMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5974232) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Tort Claim Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Tort Claim Notice Green Cards, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Ponist, Rachelle) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana LLC
Represented By: Heather T Gilbert
Represented By: Emily K VanTyle
Represented By: Thomas R Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Carter
Represented By: Mollie A Slinker
Represented By: Jason H Seitz
Represented By: Brandon M Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sevier
Represented By: Mollie A Slinker
Represented By: Jason H Seitz
Represented By: Brandon M Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roes 1-50
Represented By: Emily K VanTyle
Represented By: Heather T Gilbert
Represented By: Thomas R Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hyatte
Represented By: Mollie A Slinker
Represented By: Jason H Seitz
Represented By: Brandon M Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta J Gwillim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buford Nice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri L Swearingen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Corner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathanael D Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette L Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyrstal Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey L Elzbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alder S Candia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel B Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny L McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy M Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon M McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Book
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelynn L Crull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Heishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Cattin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice H Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle M Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad C Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawna Morson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernia L Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Scaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra L Templin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L Kersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky McFatridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie R Camblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Overmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andru Sams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mia Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy K Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Mygrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kourtney B Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Hazlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorie L Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S Morson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Fiscal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Ann Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela G Cool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Schoettmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney R Bridenthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley O Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma B Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim E Penrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikkie Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernell Freeman
Represented By: Rachelle Nichole Ponist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?