Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Selected Furniture, LLC and Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC
Defendant: Selected Furniture LLC and Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00641
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scottsdale Insurance Company answer due 10/7/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/18/20. (slm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Mason, Lawrence)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence D Mason on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (Mason, Lawrence)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Scottsdale Insurance Company on August 25, 2020, filed by Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC, Selected Furniture, LLC. (Eshoo, Edward)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Scottsdale Insurance Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
July 31, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Phillips on behalf of Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC, Selected Furniture, LLC (Phillips, Christina)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Eshoo, Jr on behalf of Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC, Selected Furniture, LLC (Eshoo, Edward) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #4 *** Modified on 7/31/2020 (ace).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Eshoo, Jr on behalf of Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC, Selected Furniture, LLC (Eshoo, Edward)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4298436.), filed by Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC, Selected Furniture, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Eshoo, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selected Furniture LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence D Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selected Furniture, LLC
Represented By: Christina M Phillips
Represented By: Edward Eshoo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana Industrial Holdings LLC
Represented By: Christina M Phillips
Represented By: Edward Eshoo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?