Wilmington Trust, National Association v. 410 South Main Street LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10 and Wilmington Trust, National Association
Defendant: Levitin & Associates, P.C., Judah A. Zelmanovitz, 410 South Main Street LLC, Law Offices of David Fleischmann, P.C., Red Realty Holdings LLC, TAC Capital, LLC, Sol Dayan, Neil Fink, Moshe Rudich, New York Capital, LLC, TAC Capital Limited Liability Company and SD CVS Realty LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00677
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered Holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2019-c10, Commercial Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10, by and through Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, in its capacity as special servicer by Sol Dayan, 410 South Main Street LLC, Red Realty Holdings LLC.(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara M Houck on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10 (Houck, Cara)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. TAC Capital, LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Lesser, Scott)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. Sol Dayan served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Lesser, Scott)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. Red Realty Holdings LLC served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Lesser, Scott)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. Neil Fink served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Lesser, Scott)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. Law Offices of David Fleischmann, P.C. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Lesser, Scott)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. Judah A. Zelmanovitz served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Lesser, Scott)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. 410 South Main Street LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Lesser, Scott)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy M Johnston terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/28/20. (slm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. (Johnston, Amy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R Lesser on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10 (Lesser, Scott)
August 19, 2020 Amended Pleading Deadline terminated. (mlc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-D, #3 Exhibit E-U)(Johnston, Amy)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Wilmington Trust to file an amended complaint, by 9/8/2020, that properly alleges the citizenship of each party. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/17/2020. (lhc)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 410 South Main Street LLC, Sol Dayan, Neil Fink, Law Offices of David Fleischmann, P.C., Levitin & Associates, P.C., New York Capital, LLC, Red Realty Holdings LLC, Moshe Rudich, TAC Capital, LLC, Judah A. Zelmanovitz. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas)
August 13, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4311215.), filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #23 Affidavit Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #24 Proposed Summons 410 South Main Street, #25 Proposed Summons Judah A. Zelmanovitz, #26 Proposed Summons Law Offices of David Fleischmann, P.C., #27 Proposed Summons Levitin & Associates, P.C., #28 Proposed Summons Moshe Rudich, #29 Proposed Summons Neil Fink, #30 Proposed Summons New York Capital, LLC, #31 Proposed Summons Red Realty Holdings, #32 Proposed Summons Sol Dayan, #33 Proposed Summons TAC Capital, LLC)(Johnston, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, National Association v. 410 South Main Street LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levitin & Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judah A. Zelmanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 410 South Main Street LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of David Fleischmann, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Realty Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAC Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sol Dayan
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moshe Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAC Capital Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SD CVS Realty LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of UBS Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C10, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-C10
Represented By: Amy M Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Amy M Johnston
Represented By: Scott R Lesser
Represented By: Cara M Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?