Ascherman v. Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Carl Eugean Ascherman
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Not Classified By Court: MIAMI E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00687
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (bas) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/1/2020) (ksc).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/30/2020. (bas)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STRIKING #1 complaint; DENYING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carl Eugean Ascherman; DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and a blank prisoner in forma pauperis petition and send them to the plaintiff; GRANTING the plaintiff to 9/18/2020, to file an amended complaint and resolve his filing fee status; and CAUTIONING him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 In forma pauperis form) (lhc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carl Eugean Ascherman. (jld)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 *STRICKEN per #4 * (unsigned) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Department of Corrections, filed by Carl Eugean Ascherman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jld) Modified on 8/18/2020 (lhc).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Carl Eugean Ascherman. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascherman v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MIAMI E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Eugean Ascherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?