Dodd v. Warden
Petitioner: Richard Dodd
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2020cv00688
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to pro se party). Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/27/2020. (slm)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler G Banks on behalf of Warden (Banks, Tyler)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE pursuant to Habeas Corpus Rule 5, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED and the filing fee is WAIVED; the Warden is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 10/23/2020, and to file a response to the petition with the entire State court record by 1/6/2021. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 9/25/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Warden)(bas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Petitioner Richard Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Ledger)(jld)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Richard Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jld) (copy of petition with case number returned to petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Tyler G Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?